AZ HB2211 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Chapter 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Corrections; treatment programs; annual report

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corrections; treatment programs; annual report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-21SenateChapter 33
2017-03-21SenateGovernor Signed
2017-03-16SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-03-16HouseTransmit to House
2017-03-16SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2017-03-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-13SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-03-13SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-06SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2017-02-28SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2017-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-1-2-0)
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-15HouseHouse JPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-19HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-18HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-01-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
13611New CodeSee Bill Text
411604.14New CodeSee Bill Text
41200New CodeSee Bill Text
41200.01New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68711
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2211p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2211h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0033.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.2211farnsworth e.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.2211judiciary and public safety.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68711&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68711&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68711&billStatusActionId=175355&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68711&billStatusActionId=175290&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68711&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68711&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68711&billStatusActionId=176505&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback