AZ HB2209 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Chapter 205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Chapter 205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Industrial commission of Arizona; continuations
Title
Industrial commission of Arizona; continuations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-15 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Representative De Los Santos to exclude the Gress flr amendment (Y: 28 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Representative De Los Santos to exclude the Gress flr amendment (Y: 28 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-18 | Senate | Chapter 205 |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-15 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (47-10-3-0) |
2024-06-15 | House | House concurs |
2024-06-14 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2024-06-14 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2024-06-14 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-06-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-0-5-0) |
2024-06-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FICO Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-29 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-0-0) |
2024-02-29 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2024-02-29 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (28-30-1-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House motion to amend |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-13 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-31 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Boiler Advisory Board
Classification (s)
Closing Conference (s)
Confidentiality Agreement (s)
Continuation
Continuations (s)
Employee Initiation (s)
Industrial Commission Of Arizona
Injunction (s)
Inspection Of Places (s)
Investigation (s)
Labor (s)
Labor - Title 23
Labor Department
Legislative Intent
Occupational Safety And Health Advisory Committee (s)
Occupational Safety And Health Review Board
Performance Of Certain Powers And Duties (s)
Practices Of Employment (s)
Prohibitions (s)
Purpose
Repeal
Repealing (s)
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Termination (s)
Violation (s)
Classification (s)
Closing Conference (s)
Confidentiality Agreement (s)
Continuation
Continuations (s)
Employee Initiation (s)
Industrial Commission Of Arizona
Injunction (s)
Inspection Of Places (s)
Investigation (s)
Labor (s)
Labor - Title 23
Labor Department
Legislative Intent
Occupational Safety And Health Advisory Committee (s)
Occupational Safety And Health Review Board
Performance Of Certain Powers And Duties (s)
Practices Of Employment (s)
Prohibitions (s)
Purpose
Repeal
Repealing (s)
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Termination (s)
Violation (s)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 108.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3024.20 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3027.09 | New Code | See Bill Text |