AZ HB2202 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriation; Navajo nation; bridge replacement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; Navajo nation; bridge replacement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05HouseHouse TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-30HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-29HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-29HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2020-01-29HouseAssigned to House TRANS Committee
2020-01-29HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-01-13HousePrefile

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback