AZ HB2184 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Secretary of state; counties; rulemaking

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secretary of state; counties; rulemaking

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateChapter 178
2018-04-11SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-05SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-05HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (53-6-1-0)
2018-04-05HouseHouse concurs
2018-04-03HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-03HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-03-28HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-06SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-28SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-16SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-15HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (53-4-3-0)
2018-02-15HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-13HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-02-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-25HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231326Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
411001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41124Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41131Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
41151.14Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49471.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49471.04Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49471.06Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49471.07Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49471.08Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49471.09Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49471.11Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69921
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2184p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2184h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2184s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0178.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2184coleman.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2184government.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2184yarbrough0449.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69921&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69921&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69921&billStatusActionId=180648&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69921&billStatusActionId=180923&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69921&billStatusActionId=180937&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69921&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69921&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69921&billStatusActionId=182447&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69921&billStatusActionId=182745&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69921&billStatusActionId=183056&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69921&billStatusActionId=183067&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback