AZ HB2180 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; menu of assessments
Title
Schools; menu of assessments
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] | Rep. John Allen [R] | Sen. Kelli Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-18 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-22-3-0) |
2015-02-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2015-02-03 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-03 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-02 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-21 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-1-0-0) |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-21 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2015-01-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |