AZ HB2175 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee
Hearing: Mar 9 @ 2:00 pm in SHR 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; residency documentation; policies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; residency documentation; policies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateSenate read second time
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (45-14-0-0)
2021-02-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-02-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-02HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-01HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-01HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-26HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-21HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-20HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-20HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2021-01-20HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15802Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74599
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2175p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2175h.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/481348
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/481711
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483038
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74599&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74599&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74599&billStatusActionId=200122&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74599&billStatusActionId=200174&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback