AZ HB2173 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Chapter 134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Chapter 134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
County aid; school districts; revisions
Title
County aid; school districts; revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Chapter 134 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-04 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurs |
2024-04-03 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2024-04-03 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2024-04-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-30 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-16 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
2023 Tax Year (s)
Additional Tax (s)
Calculations (s)
County Aid
County And State Funds (s)
County, Municipal, Community College (s)
Definition (s)
Delayed Repeal (s)
Determination (s)
Districts Ineligible For Equalization Assistance (s)
Education - Title 15
Education Finance
Emergency
Emergency Clause (s)
Equalization Assistance Payments (s)
Fiscal Year 2024-2025
Fiscal Year 2025-2026
Property Tax Reduction
Public Lands - Title 37
Repeal
Repealing (s)
Retroactivity
Revisions
School District Tax Levy
School Districts
Taxation - Title 42
Transfer (s)
Additional Tax (s)
Calculations (s)
County Aid
County And State Funds (s)
County, Municipal, Community College (s)
Definition (s)
Delayed Repeal (s)
Determination (s)
Districts Ineligible For Equalization Assistance (s)
Education - Title 15
Education Finance
Emergency
Emergency Clause (s)
Equalization Assistance Payments (s)
Fiscal Year 2024-2025
Fiscal Year 2025-2026
Property Tax Reduction
Public Lands - Title 37
Repeal
Repealing (s)
Retroactivity
Revisions
School District Tax Levy
School Districts
Taxation - Title 42
Transfer (s)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 992 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 17151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |