AZ HB2164 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Teachers; alternative performance evaluation cycle
Title
Teachers; alternative performance evaluation cycle
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0) |
2017-02-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-01-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-01-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-01-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2017-01-30 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-23 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-2-0-0) |
2017-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |