AZ HB2162 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; revenue bond authority
Title
Technical correction; revenue bond authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-30 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | House final reading , voting: (33-22-5-0) | |
2010-04-27 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-27 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-26 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-26 | Senate third reading , voting: (18-11-1-0) | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-15 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-06 | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-1-0-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2010-04-01 | Senate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-03-22 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-22 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-01 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2010-03-22 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-03-18 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-17 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-17 | House third reading , voting: (38-17-5-0) | |
2010-03-04 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-23 | House GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-2-0) | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-02-10 | House read second time | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced in House and read first time |