AZ HB2160 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prearranged funeral agreements
Title
Prearranged funeral agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | House final reading , voting: (58-0-2-0) | |
2011-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-05 | Senate third reading , voting: (20-8-2-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Consent Calendar March 07, 2011 @ 1:25 PM with Objections | |
2011-03-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-07 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Senate CE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-23 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Assigned to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-02-22 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-02-22 | House third reading , voting: (60-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-21 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-08 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-07 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-02 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2011-01-19 | House read second time | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |