AZ HB2151 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Land division; acting in concert
Title
Land division; acting in concert
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-02-14 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-2-0-0-0) |
2022-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Acting In Concert
Counties - Title 11
Land Divisions
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Property - Title 33
Counties - Title 11
Land Divisions
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Property - Title 33
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 831 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2185.09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |