AZ HB2146 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Municipalities; property sale threshold; election
Title
Municipalities; property sale threshold; election
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House County and Municipal Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House County and Municipal Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Chapter 62 | |
2016-03-24 | Governor Signed | |
2016-03-23 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-03-23 | House | House final reading , voting: (54-4-2-0) |
2016-03-23 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-03-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate FMFR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate FMFR Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FMFR Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-16 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-3-0-0) |
2016-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | House CMA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred to House CMA Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to House CMA Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |