AZ HB2145 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House third reading FAILED voting: (19-41-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House third reading FAILED voting: (19-41-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
PSPRS; CORP; death benefits; suicide
Title
PSPRS; CORP; death benefits; suicide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (19-41-0-0) |
2020-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-20 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | House | House PS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-2-0-0) |
2020-02-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Assigned to House PS Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-01-09 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Corp
Death Benefits
Pensions
Psprs
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Public Retirement System
Retroactivity
Death Benefits
Pensions
Psprs
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Public Retirement System
Retroactivity
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 846 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 888 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |