AZ HB2144 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter 257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter 257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation revisions
Title
Transportation revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 257 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-14 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (56-3-1-0) |
2021-04-14 | House | House concurs |
2021-04-13 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2021-04-13 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-08 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Adot
Aircraft
Aircraft Staggered Registration
Child Restraint System
Exemption
Fleet Vehicles
Fund
License
Motorcycles
Registration
Repeal
Salvage
Tax
Transportation (h)
Transportation - Title 28
Transportation Board (h)
Transportation Revisions (h)
Aircraft
Aircraft Staggered Registration
Child Restraint System
Exemption
Fleet Vehicles
Fund
License
Motorcycles
Registration
Repeal
Salvage
Tax
Transportation (h)
Transportation - Title 28
Transportation Board (h)
Transportation Revisions (h)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 5610 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 7675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8322 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8322.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8322.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8324 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8325 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8329 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8337 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8338 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8339 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8340 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8342 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 907 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 955.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 955.02 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 955.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |