AZ HB2136 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-19 - House APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-19 - House APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; DES; information; referral service
Title
Appropriation; DES; information; referral service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-18 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2018-01-16 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-11 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2018-01-11 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |