AZ HB2119 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1075
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Chapter 24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Chapter 24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health care insurance; amendments
Title
Health care insurance; amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion HB 2119 substituted for SB 1075. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion HB 2119 substituted for SB 1075. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | Senate | Chapter 24 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2119 substituted for SB 1075. Motion carried. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0) |
2021-02-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-26 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1075 (Replaces) 2021-02-03 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Subjects
Amendments
Director
Health Care Insurance
Insurance - Title 20
Practices
Prohibited
Prohibition
Rates
Repeal
Director
Health Care Insurance
Insurance - Title 20
Practices
Prohibited
Prohibition
Rates
Repeal
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 110 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 111 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2318 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2320 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 464 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 827 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 832 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |