AZ HB2117 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; occupational disease; presumption
Title
Workers' compensation; occupational disease; presumption
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Payne [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-29 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-3-0) |
2024-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-29 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (14-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-01-03 | House | Prefile |