AZ HB2116 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Probation credits; work time credit
Title
Probation credits; work time credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-16 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Criminal Code - Title 13
Earning Safe Reentry Through Work Act Of 2022
Effective Date
Probation
Work Time Credit
Earning Safe Reentry Through Work Act Of 2022
Effective Date
Probation
Work Time Credit