AZ HB2114 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement officers; database; rules
Title
Law enforcement officers; database; rules
Sponsors
Rep. John Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | House | House PS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-21 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned to House PS Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefile |