AZ HB2114 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
County real estate; appraisals
Title
County real estate; appraisals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 88 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-10 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-04-10 | House | House concurs |
2019-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2019-03-26 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2019-03-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-2-0-0) |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-14 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Appraisals
Board Of Supervisors
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Counties - Title 11
Real Estate
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
Board Of Supervisors
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Counties - Title 11
Real Estate
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 256 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 3603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |