AZ HB2111 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; resources; services; consolidation grants
Title
Schools; resources; services; consolidation grants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-13 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-03 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-01-16 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefile |