AZ HB2110 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Chapter 288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Civil penalties; mitigation; restitution

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil penalties; mitigation; restitution

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenateChapter 288
2021-04-28SenateGovernor Signed
2021-04-22SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-04-22HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (32-27-1-0)
2021-04-22HouseHouse concurs
2021-04-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2021-04-20HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2021-04-14HouseTransmit to House
2021-04-14SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2021-04-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-03-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-29SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-22SenateSenate TAT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-1-0)
2021-02-22SenateSenate read second time
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate TAT Committee
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (43-16-0-0)
2021-02-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-01-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-01-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-01-25HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-01-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-20HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-20HouseHouse TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-1-3-0-0)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-14HouseAssigned to House TRANS Committee
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
281603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
281604New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74499
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2110p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2110h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2110s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0288.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.21100336.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2110tat.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/480597
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/481473
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483061
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487420
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487853
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488928
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489151
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74499&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74499&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74499&billStatusActionId=200127&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74499&billStatusActionId=200161&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74499&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74499&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74499&billStatusActionId=203689&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74499&billStatusActionId=203700&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74499&billStatusActionId=203797&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74499&billStatusActionId=203807&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback