AZ HB2109 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Chapter 48
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Chapter 48
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Ballot; form; secondary property taxes
Title
Ballot; form; secondary property taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Chapter 48 | |
2015-03-23 | Governor Signed | |
2015-03-19 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (3-2-0-0) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-24 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (36-24-0-0) |
2015-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-02-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-0-0) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to House ELECT Committee |
2015-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |