AZ HB2105 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Building code moratorium; repeal.
Title
Building code moratorium; repeal.
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-4-1-0) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0) |
2018-01-30 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-30 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-29 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-01-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-01-17 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-17 | House | House LIA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to House LIA Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefile |