AZ HB2099 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Missing and murdered indigenous peoples

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Missing and murdered indigenous peoples

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0)
2021-03-09SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-08SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2021-03-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-03-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-03-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-1-0-0)
2021-03-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2021-02-22HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-19HouseHouse MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-2-0-1-0-0)
2021-01-21HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-20HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-20HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2021-01-20HouseAssigned to House MAPS Committee
2021-01-20HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74487
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2099p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2099h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2099cobb.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.2099appropriations.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484896
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485083
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485123
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485265
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486628
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487540
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74487&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74487&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74487&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74487&billStatusActionId=202764&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74487&billStatusActionId=202798&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74487&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback