AZ HB2082 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; daily recess time

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; daily recess time

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-28SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-16SenateSenate ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2017-02-28SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2017-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (39-20-1-0)
2017-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-14HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-14HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-13HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-13HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-30HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-17HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-12HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15118New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68542
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2082p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2082h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.20820202.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.20821106.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2082ed.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68542&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68542&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68542&billStatusActionId=175322&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68542&billStatusActionId=175067&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68542&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68542&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback