AZ HB2079 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Conservation districts; water; invasive vegetation
Title
Conservation districts; water; invasive vegetation
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Dunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Senate | Chapter 190 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (48-10-2-0) |
2021-04-07 | House | House concurs |
2021-04-07 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2021-04-07 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-10-2-0) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-01-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-11-1-0) |
2021-01-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-25 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-01-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-13 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-01-12 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Agricultual Lands (h)
Conservation Districts
Invasive Vegetation (h)
Invasive Vegetation Eradication
Natural Resource Conservation Districts
Powers And Duties
Public Lands
Public Lands - Title 37
Soil Health Program (h)
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Water
Conservation Districts
Invasive Vegetation (h)
Invasive Vegetation Eradication
Natural Resource Conservation Districts
Powers And Duties
Public Lands
Public Lands - Title 37
Soil Health Program (h)
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 1054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1084 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |