AZ HB2069 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
County election law amendments
Title
County election law amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Tobin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-21 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | House final reading , voting: (60-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-21 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-20 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-20 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-20 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-19 | Senate third reading , voting: (25-3-2-0) | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Consent Calendar April 12, 2010 @ 2:35 PM with Objections | |
2010-04-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-18 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-1-0) | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-23 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-02-16 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-02-16 | House third reading , voting: (57-1-1-0) | |
2010-02-08 | House Consent Calendar February 08, 2010 @ 3:15 PM | |
2010-02-09 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-09 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-08 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-21 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2010-01-12 | House read second time | |
2010-01-11 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced in House and read first time |