AZ HB2066 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Chapter 47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Chapter 47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public school tax credit: testing
Title
Public school tax credit: testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Chapter 47 | |
2015-03-23 | Governor Signed | |
2015-03-19 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-3-3-0) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-0) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-10 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (41-16-3-0) |
2015-02-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-03 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-03 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-02 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2015-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-15 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |