AZ HB2064 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - House third reading FAILED voting: (30-30-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - House third reading FAILED voting: (30-30-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Rodeo special plates
Title
Rodeo special plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (30-30-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2020-02-11 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (28-31-1-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-02-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-03 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-22 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-1-0-0) |
2020-01-16 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-12-19 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2469 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |