AZ HB2060 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Irrigation non-expansion area; substitution; acres
Title
Irrigation non-expansion area; substitution; acres
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-1-0) |
2024-02-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-1-0-0) |
2024-01-09 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-12-19 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 437 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 437.04 | New Code | See Bill Text |