AZ HB2059 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - House FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - House FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Firearms; state guard; composition; program
Title
Firearms; state guard; composition; program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | House | House FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-10 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Assigned to House FPRPP Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-12-28 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Conditional Enactment
Criminal Code - Title 13
Department Of Emergency And Military Affairs
Firearm
Firearm Possession
State Militia
Weapons
Criminal Code - Title 13
Department Of Emergency And Military Affairs
Firearm
Firearm Possession
State Militia
Weapons
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 3114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
26 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
26 | 128 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
26 | 174 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |