AZ HB2055 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Harquahala non-expansion area; groundwater transportation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harquahala non-expansion area; groundwater transportation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-28SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2022-03-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2022-03-21SenateSenate consent calendar
2022-03-21SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2022-03-09SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0)
2022-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2022-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2022-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2022-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2022-02-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2022-02-23HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (32-26-1-1)
2022-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2022-02-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2022-02-01HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2022-01-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2022-01-24HouseHouse consent calendar
2022-01-24HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2022-01-18HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-5-0-0-0-0)
2022-01-13HouseHouse read second time
2022-01-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2022-01-12HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2022-01-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2022-01-07HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45554Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/76427
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2055p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2055h.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/491647
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/491769
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/495536
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/496639
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76427&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76427&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76427&billStatusActionId=208219&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76427&billStatusActionId=208826&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76427&billStatusActionId=209023&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76427&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76427&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback