AZ HB2046 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Juror information; master jury list
Title
Juror information; master jury list
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-01-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-5-4-0) |
2024-01-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-01-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-17 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-09 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-12-11 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |