AZ HB2033 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Senate JUD Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Juvenile offenders; monetary sanctions; repeal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile offenders; monetary sanctions; repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-24SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2022-03-02SenateSenate read second time
2022-03-01SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2022-03-01SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2022-03-01SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2022-03-01SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2022-02-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2022-02-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0)
2022-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2022-02-22HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2022-02-22HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2022-02-22HouseHouse consent calendar
2022-02-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2022-02-02HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-3-0-0-0-0)
2022-01-26HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
2022-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2022-01-13HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2022-01-13HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2022-01-13HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2022-01-13HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2022-01-05HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11537Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11584Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12116.07Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121551Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411750Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41191.08Amended CodeSee Bill Text
412822Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8241Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
8243Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8243.01Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
8243.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8246Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8263Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8322Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8323Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8341.02New CodeSee Bill Text
8343Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8344Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8348Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8349Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8418Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
8503.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/76354
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2033p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2033h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2R/proposed/S.2033PETERSEN.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/491662
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/492355
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/492763
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/493216
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/495729
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/497749
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76354&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76354&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76354&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76354&billStatusActionId=209125&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76354&billStatusActionId=209292&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76354&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback