AZ HB2030 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
First responder flags; homeowners' associations
Title
First responder flags; homeowners' associations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0) |
2021-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | House | House GE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (11-2-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-13 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-12-29 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Condominiums
First Responders
Flag Displays
Homeowners' Associations
Lease
Planned Communities
Political Signs
Property - Title 33
Rent
First Responders
Flag Displays
Homeowners' Associations
Lease
Planned Communities
Political Signs
Property - Title 33
Rent
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 1261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 1808 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |