AZ HB2030 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - House final reading , voting: (16-43-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - House final reading , voting: (16-43-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Homeowners' associations; public roadways
Title
Homeowners' associations; public roadways
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Military and Government Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Military and Government Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | House final reading , voting: (16-43-1-0) | |
2012-04-30 | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-04-10 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-10 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-05 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-05 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-12 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-13 | Senate VMGA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-1-0) | |
2012-03-13 | Referred to Senate VMGA Committee | |
2012-03-13 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-12 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-12 | Assigned to Senate VMGA Committee | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-02-21 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-02-21 | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-26-2-0) | |
2012-02-16 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-14 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-14 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-13 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-07 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2012-01-10 | House read second time | |
2012-01-09 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Introduced in House and read first time |