AZ HB2016 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Chapter 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Chapter 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Grandfathered right; subsequent AMA; extension
Title
Grandfathered right; subsequent AMA; extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 16 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-03-19 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (58-0-1-0) |
2024-03-19 | House | House concurs |
2024-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2024-03-19 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2024-03-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-4-2-0) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-13-1-0) |
2024-01-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-01-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-09 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-09 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-11-21 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Application Extension (s)
Delayed Repeal
Douglas Active Management Area
Emergency
Extension (s)
Grandfathered Right
Retroactivity
Subsequent Active Management Area
Time Extension
Delayed Repeal
Douglas Active Management Area
Emergency
Extension (s)
Grandfathered Right
Retroactivity
Subsequent Active Management Area
Time Extension