AZ HB2016 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona historical society; continuation
Title
Arizona historical society; continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-02-24 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-3-2-0) |
2014-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-01-14 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-1-0) |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to House GOV Committee |
2014-01-15 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-14 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |