AZ HB2015 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; supplemental materials; approval
Title
Schools; supplemental materials; approval
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2020-02-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-5-0-2-0-0) |
2020-01-16 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-11-09 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 721 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 722 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |