AZ HB2012 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1239
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Chapter 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Chapter 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unauthorized racing meetings; penalties; racketeering
Title
Unauthorized racing meetings; penalties; racketeering
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Motion HB 2012 substituted for SB 1239. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Motion HB 2012 substituted for SB 1239. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | Chapter 6 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-02-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-9-1-0) |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2012 substituted for SB 1239. Motion carried. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (32-27-0-0) |
2021-02-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-12 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-11 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-12-17 | House | Prefile |
Same As/Similar To
SB1239 (Replaces) 2021-02-02 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Subjects
Amusements And Sports - Title 5
Criminal Code - Title 13
Dog Racing
Horse And Dog Racing
Penalties
Racing
Racketeering
Wagering
Criminal Code - Title 13
Dog Racing
Horse And Dog Racing
Penalties
Racing
Racketeering
Wagering
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 2301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 107.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |