AZ HB2009 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Budget units; encumbrance documents; exception

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget units; encumbrance documents; exception

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-13 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-12HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-11HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-11HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-12-17HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
35151Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback