AZ HB2005 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Foreign captive insurers; definition
Title
Foreign captive insurers; definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | Senate | Chapter 44 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-04-06 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2023-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-17 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-17 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-11 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-12-27 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1098 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1098.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1098.08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1098.15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1098.19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1098.21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |