AZ HB2002 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
DOC officers; personnel system; covered
Title
DOC officers; personnel system; covered
Sponsors
Rep. David Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2023-02-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-23 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (14-1-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-10 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-09 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-12-20 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Coverage
Doc (see Also: State Department Of Corrections)
Officers
State Department Of Corrections (doc)
State Government - Title 41
State Personnel System
Doc (see Also: State Department Of Corrections)
Officers
State Department Of Corrections (doc)
State Government - Title 41
State Personnel System
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 742 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 745 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 771 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |