AR SR3 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Declare Support Of Border Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Declare Support Of Border Security.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and adopted. (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-03-27SenateRead the third time and adopted.
2019-03-27SenateRoll Call Requested
2019-03-27SenateRead the third time and adopted.
2019-03-26SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-13SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-13SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-13SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-13SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-01-23SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-01-23SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback