AR SR23 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
In Support Of Expanded Liquefied Natural Gas Exports From The United States.
Title
In Support Of Expanded Liquefied Natural Gas Exports From The United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development |
2015-03-18 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SR23 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/SR23.pdf |