AR SCR12 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Reviewed and approved by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Reviewed and approved by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Commend Eudora Elementary School On Being Named A National Blue Ribbon School.
Title
To Commend Eudora Elementary School On Being Named A National Blue Ribbon School.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Reviewed and approved by the Governor. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Returned From the House as concurred in. |
2021-04-26 | House | Returned To Senate concurred in. |
2021-04-26 | House | Read the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT |
2021-04-21 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=scr12&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R |
Text | ftp://arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SCR12/SCR12041220210908.pdf |