AR SCR11 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 27 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Reviewed and approved by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Encourage The United States Congress And The United States Food And Drug Administration To Enter Into International Reciprocity Agreements For Medications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Encourage The United States Congress And The United States Food And Drug Administration To Enter Into International Reciprocity Agreements For Medications.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateReviewed and approved by the Governor.
2021-04-27SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-27SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-26SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-26SenateReturned From the House as concurred in.
2021-04-26HouseReturned To Senate concurred in.
2021-04-26HouseRead the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate
2021-04-22HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-04-21HouseRe-referred to reassign to transfer to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-04-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT
2021-04-20HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-04-20SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-04-20SenateRead the third time and adopted.
2021-04-15SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-08SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-04-08SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback