AR SB943 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Notification that SB943 is now Act 1278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Notification that SB943 is now Act 1278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Improve The Level Of Insurance For Health Care In Arkansas; And To Require That Health Insurance Information Regarding The Health Care Independence Program Be Provided To Enrollees Of The Health Care Independence Program.
Title
To Improve The Level Of Insurance For Health Care In Arkansas; And To Require That Health Insurance Information Regarding The Health Care Independence Program Be Provided To Enrollees Of The Health Care Independence Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Senate | Notification that SB943 is now Act 1278 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-04-02 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-04-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-31 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-30 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2015-03-30 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2015-03-27 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed |