AR SB812 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Create A Study To Explore How To Use The Economic Development Commission, Rural Services, Public Agencies, And Public And Private Organizations In Addressing Quality Of Life Issues And Economic Development In Underserved Areas.
Title
Create A Study To Explore How To Use The Economic Development Commission, Rural Services, Public Agencies, And Public And Private Organizations In Addressing Quality Of Life Issues And Economic Development In Underserved Areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Returned From the House as requested. | |
2011-04-01 | House Returned To the Senate as requested. | |
2011-03-30 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE | |
2011-03-30 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development | |
2011-03-23 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development | |
2011-03-04 | Senate Filed |